ID H0775 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REFUGEES -- Adds to existing law to require notification to certain officials of refugee resettlement in Idaho.
Title
Adds to existing law to require notification to certain officials of refugee resettlement in Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |