ID H0761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
VOTER IDENTIFICATION -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding voter identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 47-21-2 |
2022-03-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |