ID H0735 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 03/29/2022 SECTIONS 5-38, 54, 59 & 61; 07/01/2022 SECTIONS 1-4, 53, 55, 57, 58 & 60; 07/01/2023 SECTIONS 39-52; 07/02/2024 SECTION 62; 10/01/2024 SECTION 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 03/29/2022 SECTIONS 5-38, 54, 59 & 61; 07/01/2022 SECTIONS 1-4, 53, 55, 57, 58 & 60; 07/01/2023 SECTIONS 39-52; 07/02/2024 SECTION 62; 10/01/2024 SECTION 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTY INDIGENT SERVICES -- Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding county indigent services and finances.
Title
Amends, repeals, and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding county indigent services and finances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2022 Session Law Chapter 318 Effective: 03/29/2022 SECTIONS 5-38, 54, 59 & 61; 07/01/2022 SECTIONS 1-4, 53, 55, 57, 58 & 60; 07/01/2023 SECTIONS 39-52; 07/02/2024 SECTION 62; 10/01/2024 SECTION 56 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:44 p.m. on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-25 | House | to enrol |
2022-03-25 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-25 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2022-03-24 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2022-03-24 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2022-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-08 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |