ID H0716 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- FOSTER CARE -- Appropriates an additional $6,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Child Welfare Program for fiscal year 2019; provides legislative intent on the use of certain funds; appropriates an additional $50,000 to the Supreme Court for the Supreme Court Program for fiscal year 2019; provides an exemption for the Supreme Court from object and program transfers for fiscal year 2019; appropriates and transfers an additional $32,000 to the Public Health Districts for fiscal year 2019; and provides legislative intent on the allocation of funds by the Public Health Districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $6,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Child Welfare Program for fiscal year 2019; provides legislative intent on the use of certain funds; appropriates an additional $50,000 to the Supreme Court for the Supreme Court Program for fiscal year 2019; provides an exemption for the Supreme Court from object and program transfers for fiscal year 2019; appropriates and transfers an additional $32,000 to the Public Health Districts for fiscal year 2019; and provides legislative intent on the allocation of funds by the Public Health Districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-22Senateto House
2018-03-22SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-22SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-03-22SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-22SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-21SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-21Houseto Senate
2018-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback