ID H0704 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 340 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTIONS 7-9; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- PUBLIC HEALTH SERVICES -- Appropriates $120,147,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Public Health Services Division for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 237.02; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; limits the transfer of funds budgeted for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; provides for a plan on suicide prevention and awareness; transfers $1,831,000 from trustee and benefit payments to operating expenditures for the Department of Health and Welfare Physical Health Services Program for fiscal year 2018; and provides for a cash transfer from the Idaho Immunization Dedicated Vaccine Fund to the General Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $120,147,300 to the Department of Health and Welfare for the Public Health Services Division for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 237.02; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; limits the transfer of funds budgeted for trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; provides for a plan on suicide prevention and awareness; transfers $1,831,000 from trustee and benefit payments to operating expenditures for the Department of Health and Welfare Physical Health Services Program for fiscal year 2018; and provides for a cash transfer from the Idaho Immunization Dedicated Vaccine Fund to the General Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 340 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTIONS 7-9; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-21SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-19Houseto Senate
2018-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-19HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-16HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback