ID H0703 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $395,400 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $2,609,200 to the Department of Health and Welfare for statewide substance abuse treatment and prevention for fiscal year 2011; and provides legislative intent for the WITS system modifications and access to recovery funding.
Title
Appropriates $395,400 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $2,609,200 to the Department of Health and Welfare for statewide substance abuse treatment and prevention for fiscal year 2011; and provides legislative intent for the WITS system modifications and access to recovery funding.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-26 | to House | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-25 | to Fin | |
2010-03-25 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-25 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-24 | to Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-24 | McGeachin | |
2010-03-24 | 54-13-3 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Boe, Bolz, Boyle, Chadderdon, Collins, Crane, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hagedorn, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Jarvis, Killen, Kren, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Mathews, McGeachin, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Raybould, Roberts, Ruchti, Schaefer, Shepherd(08), Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Burgoyne, Chavez, Chew, Clark, Cronin, Durst, King, Pasley-Stuart, Pence, Ringo, Rusche, Sayler, Shepherd(02) Absent and excused -- Hart, Harwood, Labrador Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-24 | PASSED | |
2010-03-24 | Rls susp | |
2010-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-24 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-23 | to printing | |
2010-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-23 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0703.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0703.pdf |