ID H0696 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the fiscal year 2012 appropriation to the State Board of Education, Health Education programs to move operating expenditures to personnel costs; and appropriates $10,925,200 to the State Board of Education, Health Education Programs for fiscal year 2013.
Title
Amends the fiscal year 2012 appropriation to the State Board of Education, Health Education programs to move operating expenditures to personnel costs; and appropriates $10,925,200 to the State Board of Education, Health Education Programs for fiscal year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 250 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-29 | To enrol | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | Bilyeu | |
2012-03-28 | 34-0-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Schmidt Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-28 | PASSED | |
2012-03-28 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-28 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-28 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-27 | to Fin | |
2012-03-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-27 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-26 | to Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | Wood(27) | |
2012-03-26 | 65-4-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Lake, Moyle Absent and excused -- Sims Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-26 | PASSED | |
2012-03-26 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-22 | to printing | |
2012-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-22 | House intro |