ID H0695 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTION 12 & 13; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS - HEALTH AND WELFARE - MEDICAID - Appropriates $2,445,650,500 for the Medicaid Division in the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 216.00; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs transfers from trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; requires reports on Medicaid expenditures and forecasts, for managed care implementation, and flexible spending authority; limits program transfers; provides legislative intent for non-emergency medical transportation; requires cost-sharing; and appropriates an additional $58,296,900 for the Medicaid Division for fiscal year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPROPRIATIONS - HEALTH AND WELFARE - MEDICAID - Appropriates $2,445,650,500 for the Medicaid Division in the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 216.00; provides for transfers to the Cooperative Welfare Fund; directs transfers from trustee and benefit payments; provides for program integrity; requires reports on Medicaid expenditures and forecasts, for managed care implementation, and flexible spending authority; limits program transfers; provides legislative intent for non-emergency medical transportation; requires cost-sharing; and appropriates an additional $58,296,900 for the Medicaid Division for fiscal year 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2018 Session Law Chapter 339 Effective: 03/28/2018 SECTION 12 & 13; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 23-11-1
2018-03-21SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-20SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-19Houseto Senate
2018-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-19HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-19HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-16HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback