ID H0685 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 03/26/2018 SECTION 4 & 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF LANDS -- Appropriates $59,362,800 to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 321.15; exempts certain appropriation object transfer limitations; appropriates and transfers $20,000,000 from the General Fund to the Fire Suppression Deficiency Fund for fiscal year 2018; and provides legislative authorization for prior period adjustments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $59,362,800 to the Department of Lands for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 321.15; exempts certain appropriation object transfer limitations; appropriates and transfers $20,000,000 from the General Fund to the Fire Suppression Deficiency Fund for fiscal year 2018; and provides legislative authorization for prior period adjustments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 278 Effective: 03/26/2018 SECTION 4 & 5; 07/01/2018 all other SECTIONS
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-19Senateto House
2018-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-16SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-14Houseto Senate
2018-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback