ID H0680 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $32,372,500 to the Idaho Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 143.5; provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits; permits the department to exceed the 10% transfer between programs limitation for certain project grants; and provides carryover authority for the development program from fiscal year 2012 into fiscal year 2013.
Title
Appropriates $32,372,500 to the Idaho Department of Parks and Recreation for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 143.5; provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits; permits the department to exceed the 10% transfer between programs limitation for certain project grants; and provides carryover authority for the development program from fiscal year 2012 into fiscal year 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 245 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-28 | To enrol | |
2012-03-27 | to House | |
2012-03-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 30-0-5 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-21 | to Fin | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | Eskridge | |
2012-03-20 | 64-2-4 AYES -- Anderson, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Gibbs, Loertscher Absent and excused -- Andrus, Higgins, Lake, Pence Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | PASSED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-16 | to printing | |
2012-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-16 | House intro |