ID H0678 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the fiscal year 2012 appropriation for the Department of Correction to move a total of $625,200 between expense classes for community-based substance abuse treatment; appropriates an additional $1,500,000 to the Department of Correction for county and out-of-state placement for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $187,100,000 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 1,561.93; exempts a portion of the appropriation from program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Amends the fiscal year 2012 appropriation for the Department of Correction to move a total of $625,200 between expense classes for community-based substance abuse treatment; appropriates an additional $1,500,000 to the Department of Correction for county and out-of-state placement for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $187,100,000 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 1,561.93; exempts a portion of the appropriation from program transfer limitations; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 243 Effective: 04/03/12 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-28 | To enrol | |
2012-03-27 | to House | |
2012-03-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-3 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-21 | to Fin | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | Bolz | |
2012-03-20 | 68-1-1 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Ringo Absent and excused -- Higgins Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | PASSED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-16 | to printing | |
2012-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-16 | House intro |