ID H0672 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF THE STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Appropriates $15,961,200 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 34.25; authorizes the reappropriation of the Federal Grant Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Public Charter School Authorizers Fund; provides legislative intent regarding dual credit students; and provides legislative intent regarding reporting annual payments to the Idaho State Building authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $15,961,200 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2019; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 34.25; authorizes the reappropriation of the Federal Grant Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Public Charter School Authorizers Fund; provides legislative intent regarding dual credit students; and provides legislative intent regarding reporting annual payments to the Idaho State Building authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 270 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-20Senateto House
2018-03-20SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-20SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 -Engelking
2018-03-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-15Houseto Senate
2018-03-15HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-15HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-14-4
2018-03-14HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-13HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-12HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback