ID H0672 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds to existing law relating to fiscal matters of school districts providing provisions relating to certain maintenance match moneys for the maintenance and repair of certain student-occupied buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law relating to fiscal matters of school districts providing provisions relating to certain maintenance match moneys for the maintenance and repair of certain student-occupied buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-05 Governor signed Session Law Chapter 331 Effective: 07/01/12
2012-03-29 Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29
2012-03-29 To Governor
2012-03-29 Pres signed
2012-03-29 Sp signed
2012-03-29 Rpt enrol
2012-03-28 To enrol
2012-03-28 to House
2012-03-28 Title apvd
2012-03-28 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0
2012-03-27 to 3rd rdg
2012-03-27 2nd rdg
2012-03-26 to 2nd rdg
2012-03-26 rec d/p
2012-03-26 Rpt out
2012-03-26 to Educ
2012-03-26 1st rdg
2012-03-26 Senate intro
2012-03-23 to Senate
2012-03-23 Title apvd
2012-03-23 Shirley
2012-03-23 63-4-3 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Killen, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Bedke, Lake, Moyle, Ringo Absent and excused -- Jaquet, McGeachin, McMillan Floor Sponsor
2012-03-23 PASSED
2012-03-23 Rls susp
2012-03-23 to 3rd rdg
2012-03-23 2nd rdg
2012-03-22 to 2nd rdg
2012-03-22 rec d/p
2012-03-22 Rpt out
2012-03-16 to Educ
2012-03-16 Rpt prt
2012-03-15 to printing
2012-03-15 1st rdg
2012-03-15 House intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback