ID H0671 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JUVENILE OFFENDERS -- Amends existing law to allow certain juvenile offenders to apply for the expungement of criminal records after three years of good behavior.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to allow certain juvenile offenders to apply for the expungement of criminal records after three years of good behavior.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-14Houseto Senate
2018-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-14HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-14HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback