ID H0671 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 196 Effective: 03/31/10 Section 1; 07/01/10 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 196 Effective: 03/31/10 Section 1; 07/01/10 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the fiscal year 2010 appropriation by $321,900; appropriates $29,472,700 to the Department of Commerce for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 53.
Title
Reduces the fiscal year 2010 appropriation by $321,900; appropriates $29,472,700 to the Department of Commerce for fiscal year 2011; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 53.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 196 Effective: 03/31/10 Section 1; 07/01/10 All other sections | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-26 | To enrol | |
2010-03-25 | to House | |
2010-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-19 | to Fin | |
2010-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-19 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-18 | to Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 59-7-4 | |
2010-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-16 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-15 | to printing | |
2010-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-15 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0671.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0671.pdf |