ID H0666 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ADMINISTRATIVE RULES -- Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2018, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2019, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2019, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules set to expire on July 1, 2018, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2019, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2019, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect, and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 299 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-13Houseto Senate
2018-03-13HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-13HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-14-2
2018-03-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-07HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-03-06HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback