ID H0665 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 03/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 03/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SCHOOLS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 23, 2018 Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 03/23/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-09 | House | PASSED 52-12-6 |
2018-03-09 | House | Motion to send to Gen Ord, motion failed |
2018-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2018-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |