ID H0664 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $423,400 to the Idaho State Tax Commission for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $35,865,100 to the Idaho State Tax Commission for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 461; provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits; and expresses legislative intent with regard to the Tax Compliance Initiative.
Title
Appropriates an additional $423,400 to the Idaho State Tax Commission for fiscal year 2012; appropriates $35,865,100 to the Idaho State Tax Commission for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 461; provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits; and expresses legislative intent with regard to the Tax Compliance Initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 235 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 1; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-23 | To enrol | |
2012-03-22 | to House | |
2012-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-19 | to Fin | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-16 | to Senate | |
2012-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-16 | Bolz | |
2012-03-16 | 59-2-9 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao(Reynoldson), Black, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harwood, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35) NAYS -- McMillan(McMillan), Sims Absent and excused -- Barbieri, Block(Block), Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Hart, Hartgen, Henderson, Roberts, Mr. Speaker Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-16 | PASSED | |
2012-03-16 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-15 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-14 | to printing | |
2012-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-14 | House intro |