ID H0663 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - U.C. to be returned to Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SCHOOLS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding threatening school violence and to provide that certain acts shall be a felony.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseU.C. to be returned to Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-05HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback