ID H0663 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - 3rd rdg -- Ret'd to Educ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - 3rd rdg -- Ret'd to Educ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to define terms; to define a term, to establish provisions assigning a factor for eligible public charter schools and to establish provisions relating to a calculation.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to define terms; to define a term, to establish provisions assigning a factor for eligible public charter schools and to establish provisions relating to a calculation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg -- Ret'd to Educ | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-14 | to Educ | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-13 | to printing | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-13 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/H0663.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/H0663.pdf |