ID H0655 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COMMERCIAL VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to revise the definitions of Class A and B driver's licenses and to revise the definition of a “commercial motor vehicle” to reflect actual weight of the vehicle, not manufacturer rating.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definitions of Class A and B driver's licenses and to revise the definition of a “commercial motor vehicle” to reflect actual weight of the vehicle, not manufacturer rating.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2018-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-07Houseto Senate
2018-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback