ID H0650 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - to Agric Aff
Pending: Senate Agricultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - to Agric Aff
Pending: Senate Agricultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to animal care to revise a definition and to define a term; to provide for violations relating to committing torture to companion animals, to provide that certain officers may take possession of companion animals subjected to torture; to provide for violations and penalties relating to certain displays of combat between gamecocks; and to revise provisions relating to penalties for violations.
Title
Amends existing law relating to animal care to revise a definition and to define a term; to provide for violations relating to committing torture to companion animals, to provide that certain officers may take possession of companion animals subjected to torture; to provide for violations and penalties relating to certain displays of combat between gamecocks; and to revise provisions relating to penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-15 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-14 | to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-14 | Andrus | |
2012-03-14 | 64-4-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao(Reynoldson), Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan(McMillan), Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Hart, Harwood Absent and excused -- Trail, Wills Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-14 | PASSED | |
2012-03-14 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-12 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-09 | to printing | |
2012-03-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-09 | House intro |