ID H0649 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 265 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Adds to existing law to provide that certain persons seeking or needing medical assistance for a drug-related overdose shall not be charged or prosecuted for certain crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that certain persons seeking or needing medical assistance for a drug-related overdose shall not be charged or prosecuted for certain crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 265 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018
2018-03-21HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-16Senateto House
2018-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-1-2
2018-03-14SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-13SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-27HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback