ID H0648 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- Amends existing law to provide that taxing districts must deduct certain sales and use tax revenue growth from the property tax budget limitations.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that taxing districts must deduct certain sales and use tax revenue growth from the property tax budget limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-24-3 |
2022-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 28, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |