ID H0647 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 01/01/03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 01/01/03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to delete a sunset clause relating to the Small Lawsuit Resolution Act.
Title
Amends existing law to delete a sunset clause relating to the Small Lawsuit Resolution Act.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 184 Effective: 01/01/03 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-26 | To enrol | |
2010-03-25 | to House | |
2010-03-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-19 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-19 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-15 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-15 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-12 | to Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-12 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2010-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-10 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-09 | to printing | |
2010-03-09 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-09 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0647.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0647.pdf |