ID H0645 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMUNITY COLLEGES -- Amends existing law to provide for filling vacancies on a community college board of trustees and to revise provisions regarding trustee elections.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for filling vacancies on a community college board of trustees and to revise provisions regarding trustee elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, March 3, 2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |