ID H0644 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMES AND PUNISHMENTS -- Amends and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding criminal diversion programs.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding criminal diversion programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-1-5 |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |