ID H0642 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2018 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATIONS AND CONDOMINIUMS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for statements of account and disclosure of fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to provide for statements of account and disclosure of fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2018 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 16, 2018
2018-03-16HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-15SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-15SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-14HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-13Senateto House
2018-03-13SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 28-6-1
2018-03-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-05Houseto Senate
2018-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-05HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Business
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee, Returned to the Desk for re-referral
2018-02-28HouseReported Printed and Referred to Local Government
2018-02-27HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback