ID H0642 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2016 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2016 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - COMMISSION ON THE ARTS - Appropriates $1,956,200 to the Commission on the Arts for fiscal year 2017; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 10.
Title
Appropriates $1,956,200 to the Commission on the Arts for fiscal year 2017; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 31, 2016 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Schmidt |
2016-03-24 | Senate | 33-2-0 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- Nuxoll, Vick Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-24 | House | Horman |
2016-03-24 | House | 51-17-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Chew, Clow, Collins, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Erpelding, Gannon, Gibbs, Hartgen, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, McCrostie, McDonald, Miller, Monks, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rubel, Rudolph, Rusche, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Batt, Cheatham, Crane, Dixon, Gestrin, Harris, Hixon, Luker, McMillan, Mendive, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Scott, Shepherd, Sims Absent -- Anderst, Malek Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-24 | House | PASSED |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2016-03-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |