ID H0639 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOND ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond election for eleven months after a failed bond election.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a taxing district may not run another bond election for eleven months after a failed bond election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 37-32-1 |
2018-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |