ID H0630 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding rural education support networks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding rural education support networks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full -- FAILED 20-48-2
2018-03-06HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback