ID H0630 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding rural education support networks.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding rural education support networks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 20-48-2 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2018-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |