ID H0627 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 03/19/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DIVISION OF BUILDING SAFETY -- Appropriates an additional $60,200 in federal funds to the Division of Building Safety for fiscal year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $60,200 in federal funds to the Division of Building Safety for fiscal year 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 115 Effective: 03/19/2018
2018-03-14HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on March 13, 2018
2018-03-13HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-12SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-12SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-08HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-07Senateto House
2018-03-07SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-07SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-28Houseto Senate
2018-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback