ID H0626 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 261 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BONDED INDEBTEDNESS ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise requirements for official statements in elections authorizing bonded indebtedness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise requirements for official statements in elections authorizing bonded indebtedness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 261 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018
2018-03-21HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-16Senateto House
2018-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-03-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-28Houseto Senate
2018-02-28HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-28HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 62-8-0
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback