ID H0625 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OPIOID TAX -- Amends and adds to existing law to impose a tax on the sale and distribution of opioids, with proceeds going to fund addiction programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends and adds to existing law to impose a tax on the sale and distribution of opioids, with proceeds going to fund addiction programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseTake bill off General Orders; referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-03-05HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-26HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-23HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback