ID H0622 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES -- Adds to existing law to provide that, except as otherwise permitted by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, no public institution of higher education shall abridge the constitutional freedom of any individual to speak on campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide that, except as otherwise permitted by the First Amendment to the United States Constitution, no public institution of higher education shall abridge the constitutional freedom of any individual to speak on campus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback