ID H0618 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 126 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 126 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,680,500 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 13; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $1,680,500 to the Division of Human Resources for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 13; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 126 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/21 | |
2012-03-21 | To Governor | |
2012-03-20 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-19 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-16 | To enrol | |
2012-03-15 | to House | |
2012-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-08 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-08 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-07 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-06 | to Fin | |
2012-03-06 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-06 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-05 | to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2012-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-29 | to printing | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | House intro |