ID H0617 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to 14th Order for amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT -- Amends existing law to revise and remove provisions regarding expiration of administrative rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise and remove provisions regarding expiration of administrative rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2020-03-18SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2020-03-12SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-03-12Houseto Senate
2020-03-12HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-12HouseRules Suspended:
2020-03-12HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2020-03-09HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback