ID H0612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2018 Session Law Chapter 58 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- TECHNOLOGY INFRASTRUCTURE FUNDING -- Creates the Technology Infrastructure Stabilization Fund; and appropriates and transfers $22,000,000 from the General Fund to the Technology Infrastructure Stabilization Fund for FY 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Technology Infrastructure Stabilization Fund; and appropriates and transfers $22,000,000 from the General Fund to the Technology Infrastructure Stabilization Fund for FY 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 13, 2018 Session Law Chapter 58 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-09HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:21 a.m. on March 8, 2018
2018-03-08HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-07SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-07SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-06HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-05Senateto House
2018-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-02-27SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-02-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-22Houseto Senate
2018-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-2
2018-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback