ID H0607 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SERVICES -- Adds to and repeals existing law to provide for the Office of Information Technology Services in the Office of the Governor, to provide for the receipt of payment for services to units of state government, to provide for the general powers and duties of the authority and to provide for the transfer of responsibility for the integrated property records system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and repeals existing law to provide for the Office of Information Technology Services in the Office of the Governor, to provide for the receipt of payment for services to units of state government, to provide for the general powers and duties of the authority and to provide for the transfer of responsibility for the integrated property records system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018
2018-03-21HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-20SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-16Senateto House
2018-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2018-03-14SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-03-06SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-05Houseto Senate
2018-03-05HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-05HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-19HouseReported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback