ID H0606 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 07/01/2023 SECTION 2 & 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

OPEN MEETINGS LAW -- Amends, adds to and repeals existing law to revise the definition of “public agency” and to provide a sunset clause.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends, adds to and repeals existing law to revise the definition of “public agency” and to provide a sunset clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2018 SECTION 1; 07/01/2023 SECTION 2 & 3
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-09Senateto House
2018-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-09SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2018-03-05SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2018-02-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-26Houseto Senate
2018-02-26HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-26HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3
2018-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 26, 2018
2018-02-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-19HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback