ID H0605 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ret'd to Educ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to a fee for a criminal history check; to provide that the school districts shall provide the State Department of Education certain electronic mail addresses of all certificated employees and to provide for a notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to a fee for a criminal history check; to provide that the school districts shall provide the State Department of Education certain electronic mail addresses of all certificated employees and to provide for a notification.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-05 Ret'd to Educ
2012-03-05 to 3rd rdg
2012-03-05 2nd rdg
2012-03-02 to 2nd rdg
2012-03-02 rec d/p
2012-03-02 Rpt out
2012-02-29 to Educ
2012-02-29 Rpt prt
2012-02-28 to printing
2012-02-28 1st rdg
2012-02-28 House intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback