ID H0604 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

ANNEXATION -- Amends existing law to provide a requirement regarding annexation of certain agricultural land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide a requirement regarding annexation of certain agricultural land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 58-11-1
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-02-23HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-02-23HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2018-02-23HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2018-02-23HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2018-02-21HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-16HouseReported Printed and Referred to Local Government
2018-02-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback