ID H0594 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2 & 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTION -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “agricultural equipment and machinery” for property tax-exemption purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the definition of “agricultural equipment and machinery” for property tax-exemption purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 297 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2018 SECTION 1; 01/01/2020 SECTION 2 & 3
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-22Houseto enrol
2018-03-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-22HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-22HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-22HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2018-03-22HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2018-03-22HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2018-03-22HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 33-0-2
2018-03-21SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-21SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-21SenateAmendments reported printed
2018-03-21SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2018-03-21SenateAmendments ordered printed
2018-03-21SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2018-03-20SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback