ID H0593 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
Pending: Senate Local Government and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PROPERTY TAX -- Amends existing law to exempt church-owned properties from a certain management requirement in order to qualify for a property tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to exempt church-owned properties from a certain management requirement in order to qualify for a property tax exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-26HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback