ID H0587 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAY DISTRICTS -- Amends existing law to revise the allocation of property tax revenues between a highway district and a revenue allocation area within the highway district.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the allocation of property tax revenues between a highway district and a revenue allocation area within the highway district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 259 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:50 p.m. on March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | to enrol |
2020-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-19 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-03-19 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-03-19 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 27-5-3 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred to 14th Order for amendment |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |