ID H0580 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SEX CRIMES - Repeals and amends existing law to provide a circumstance where rape can occur and to provide that both males and females are capable of committing rape; and to revise terminology in the definition of "rape" to make it gender neutral.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and amends existing law to provide a circumstance where rape can occur and to provide that both males and females are capable of committing rape; and to revise terminology in the definition of "rape" to make it gender neutral.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-18 - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-30HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2016
2016-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 25, 2016
2016-03-25HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-24SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2016-03-24SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2016-03-24HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2016-03-23HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2016-03-23Senateto House
2016-03-23SenateTitle apvd
2016-03-23SenateLodge
2016-03-23Senate35-0-0 AYES -- Anthon, Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Rohn(Buckner-Webb), Burgoyne, Davis, Den Hartog, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Harris, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Jordan, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lee, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Souza, Stennett, Thayn, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor
2016-03-23SenatePASSED
2016-03-23SenateRead third time in full
2016-03-23SenateRead in full as required)
2016-03-23SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2016-03-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2016-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2016-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2016-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2016-03-18Houseto Senate
2016-03-18HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-18HousePASSED -- 67-0-3
2016-03-18HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-03-17HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-16HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
2016-03-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback