ID H0579 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

EDUCATION -- Repeals and amends existing law to establish provisions regarding sex education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and amends existing law to establish provisions regarding sex education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseTake bill off General Orders; referred to Education
2018-02-19HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2018-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Education
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback