ID H0578 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-20 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to legal tender to establish provisions relating to the designation of certain legal tender and to establish provisions relating to the payment of certain taxes; to establish provisions relating to the prohibition of certain forms of taxation upon certain transactions and to provide for a civil suit and the awarding of certain costs; and to provide that any capital gain on the exchange of gold and silver coin for another form of United States legal tender shall not be included in taxable income.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to legal tender to establish provisions relating to the designation of certain legal tender and to establish provisions relating to the payment of certain taxes; to establish provisions relating to the prohibition of certain forms of taxation upon certain transactions and to provide for a civil suit and the awarding of certain costs; and to provide that any capital gain on the exchange of gold and silver coin for another form of United States legal tender shall not be included in taxable income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2012-03-20 | Hart | |
2012-03-20 | 35-35-0 AYES -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bilbao, Boyle, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Eskridge, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Loertscher, Luker, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Raybould, Roberts, Schaefer, Shepherd, Simpson, Sims, Thayn, Thompson, Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Anderson, Bedke, Bell, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Cronin, Ellsworth, Gibbs, Guthrie, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Marriott, Nesset, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Ringo, Rusche, Shirley, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27) Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | FAILED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-19 | to engros | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-12 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | House intro |