ID H0577 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
YOUTH ATHLETES -- Amends existing law to provide that certain chiropractic physicians are qualified health professionals for purposes of returning athletes to play after suspected concussions or head injuries.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain chiropractic physicians are qualified health professionals for purposes of returning athletes to play after suspected concussions or head injuries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-9-0 |
2020-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |